Case Information: 51612 | |||
Short Caption: | FIRE INS. EXCH. VS. SHAW | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A528491 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/31/2008 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/13/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP check no. 5810. | ||
05/13/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 08-11861 | |
06/04/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-14120 | |
06/09/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days | 08-14450 | |
07/22/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. | 08-18889 | |
07/30/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. for extension of time to file the transcript request form. Court reporter Janie Olsen is not required to file a certificate of delivery in this. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-19616 | |
07/30/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/15/07. To Court Reporter: Janie L. Olsen. | 08-17354 | |
09/25/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | 08-24757 | |
10/14/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-26455 | |
10/14/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols 1-3. | 08-26456 | |
11/05/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 12, 2008. | 08-28231 | |
12/11/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Respondent's (Weiss) Notice to Non-Opposition to Appellant's Opening Brief. | 08-31514 | |
12/31/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. we hereby submit this appeal for decision on the opening brief. fn1-[ Respondent Raquel Shaw is not represented by counsel in this appeal and has not been granted permission to file briefs and papers in proper person.] | 08-33097 | |
12/31/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/06/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Appellant's Notice of Non-Opposition by all Respondents. | 09-00278 | |
02/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion to Resolve Appeal on Confession of Error and Directing Full Briefing. Answering Brief due: 30 days. | 09-03373 | |
04/21/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Appellant's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 09-09909 | |
05/05/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. We grant appellant's request to voluntarily dismiss the appeal. Accordingly, "we hereby dismiss this appeal." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. | 09-11124 | |
05/05/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |