Case Information: 51619 | |||
Short Caption: | STEINBERG VS. STEINBERG (CHILD CUSTODY) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51093 , 58524 , 62198 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D363637 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 09/24/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/14/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Sabina F. Steinberg--check no. 1230. | ||
05/14/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order mailed to proper person appellant. Completed civil proper person appeal statement has been received from appellant.) | 08-12101 | |
05/14/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Transferred from docket no. 51093. | 08-12103 | |
06/02/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 08-13805 | |
06/03/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 08-13980 | |
06/17/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Response. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal-Appellant. | 08-15361 | |
08/21/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | 08-21540 | |
09/08/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Dismissing Appeal in Docket No. 51093, Order Denying Motions to Dismiss, Directing Supplemental Proper Person Appeal Statement, and Directing Transmission of Record in Docket No. 51619. Civil Appeal Statement due: 30 days. We direct this court's clerk to mail appellant an additional civil proper person appeal statement form. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Nos. 51093/51619. | 08-23018 | |
09/24/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 8. | 08-24675 | |
09/24/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
10/10/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. for Enlargement of Pages and Time to File the Additional Pages on Appeal Statement. | 08-26179 | |
10/24/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplement to her appeal statement. Appellant's supplement shall not exceed 20 pages. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date that appellant's supplemental appeal statement is served to file and serve his response (30 pages). fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to file appellant's civil proper person appeal statement, provisionally received on October 10, 2008.] | 08-27388 | |
10/24/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-26184 | |
11/14/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. (Supplement). | 08-29078 | |
12/04/2008 | Brief | Filed Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-30890 | |
12/18/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for an Order to Submit a Reply to Civil Respondent's Response Appeal Statement. | 08-32101 | |
12/18/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for an Order to Allow the Appellant to Correct the Exhibit Number. | 08-32102 | |
02/05/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motions. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve her reply statement and to correct the exhibit number. | 09-03230 | |
02/24/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Correct Exhibit Number. | 09-04835 | |
02/24/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Response. Reply to Respondent's Response. | 09-04836 | |
05/01/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. (via fax) oopy of Order filed in district court on August 22, 2008. | 09-10844 | |
05/08/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-JH/RP/KP fn2[We grant appellant's February 24, 2009, motion to correct an exhibit number.] | 09-11419 | |
06/02/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-12805 | |
06/02/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/10/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2009. | 09-12805 | |
12/14/2018 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document - "Request for Confidentiality of Documents filed Under Cases #51093 and 51619." | 18-908860 |