Case Information: 51618 | |||
Short Caption: | SMITH (JEREMIAH) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C234620 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/13/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for Jeremiah J. Smith, Appellant | 08-12012 | |
05/13/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/13/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. This fast track appeal has been docketed as an electronic case. The Nevada Supreme Court Electronic Filing Pilot Program Rules and NRAP 3C govern this case. | 08-12013 | |
05/13/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Request for Rough Draft Transcript. Court Reporters: Kiara Schmidt and Jessica Ramirez. Transcripts requested: 7/10/07, 2/5/08 and 3/31/08. | 08-12014 | |
05/27/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/10/07. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-13276 | |
06/03/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Angela K. Lee stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/30/08. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-14015 | |
06/06/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jessica Ramirez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: no dates given. | 08-14361 | |
06/16/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: February 1, 2008. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-15335 | |
06/20/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time for Fast Track Statement | 08-15898 | |
06/26/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Fast track statement and appendix due: July 23, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-16289 | |
07/24/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File 13 Page Fast Track Statement | 08-19073 | |
07/24/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. The motion for leave to file a 13-page Fast Track Statement is approved. It is so ordered that the fast track statement may be filed in excess of 10 pages to-wit 13 pages. | 08-19074 | |
07/24/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Fast Track Statement | 08-19075 | |
07/24/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Appendix | 08-19076 | |
08/12/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response | 08-20774 | |
09/05/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Supplemental fast track response due: 15 days. We caution respondent that failure to file a supplemental fast track response will result in this court reviewing this appeal based on the record before this court. | 08-22883 | |
09/05/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Supplemental Fast Track Response | 08-23004 | |
05/01/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-10846 | |
05/26/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-12190 | |
05/26/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/04/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 1, 2009. | 09-12190 |