Case Information: 51597 | |||
Short Caption: | SESSIONS (DANIEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR073081 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/12/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for Daniel Sessions, Appellant | 08-11709 | |
05/12/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/12/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. This fast track appeal has been docketed as an electronic case. The Nevada Supreme Court Electronic Filing Pilot Program Rules and NRAP 3C govern this case. | 08-11710 | |
06/23/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Notice of Telephonic Extension. Fast track statement and appendix due: June 30, 2008. | 08-15960 | |
06/30/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to file Fast Track Statement | 08-16656 | |
07/14/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Fast track statement and appendix due: July 30, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-17915 | |
07/31/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Fast Track Statement | 08-19894 | |
07/31/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix | 08-19895 | |
08/07/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response | 08-20507 | |
01/14/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-01156 | |
02/10/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-01896 | |
02/10/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/19/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 11, 2009. | 09-01896 |