judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PANDELIS CONSTR. VS. CULTURE CLUB OF LV

Case Information: 51613
Short Caption:PANDELIS CONSTR. VS. CULTURE CLUB OF LVCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A544961Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/16/2008 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/13/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Shimon & Lovaas check no. 5311.
05/13/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 08-11875
05/16/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan 08-12395
05/29/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-13433
05/29/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/17/08. 08-13491
06/02/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-13836
06/09/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 08-14545
06/09/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Appearance-Shimon and Smith. PC-Appellant. 08-14548
06/13/2008MotionFiled Motion. Shimon & Smith, PC in the place and stead of the law firm Shimon & Lovaas. 08-15187
06/24/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 08-16125
07/03/2008Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-16924
07/18/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/21/08 and 04/24/08. To Court Reporter: Julie Lever. 08-18548
07/18/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/08/08 and 02/21/08. To Court Reporter: Angela Lee. 08-18549
09/05/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Julie Lever (2/21/08 and 4/24/08) and Angela Lee (1/08/08 and 2/21/08) to file certificate of delivery of transcripts. Due date: 10 days. 08-22961
09/09/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Julie Lever stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: No dates specified. 08-23235
09/17/2008TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 4/24/08 Court Reporter: Julie Lever 08-23955
09/18/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. -Certificate of Service of Transcript with the transcript attached. Submitted by attorney for appellant. 08-24197
09/23/2008Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. -Letter from Court Reporter Angela Lee regarding the transcripts for 1/09/08 and 2/21/08. 08-24565
10/03/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-25625
10/03/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 08-25626
10/20/2008MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Respondent Culture Club of Las Vegas, LLC. 08-26989
10/30/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Respondent Stratosphere Corporation's Motion to Extend Time to File an Answering Brief. (60 days). 08-27826
11/25/2008MotionFiled Motion. Supplement to Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Respondent Culture Club of Las Vegas, LLC. 08-30082
12/05/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorney Diana L. Sullivan, of the law firm of Ghanem & Sullivan, LLP, has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for respondent Culture Club of Las Vegas, LLC. We grant the motion to withdraw. Culture Club shall have 30 days from the date of this order to obtain new counsel and cause counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. Briefing is hereby stayed pending Culture Club's response to this order. Within ten days from the date of this order, appellant shall notify this court in writing whether it will utilize NRAP 9(d) with respect to the unavailable transcript of the February 21, 2008, proceedings. fn1[Culture Club's and Stratosphere Corporation's unopposed motions for 60 day extensions of time to file their answering briefs are disapproved as moot.] 08-30984
12/29/2008MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Notice in Response to Court's Order Dated December 5, 2008. 08-32849
01/09/2009Other Returned Mail. Order filed 12/5/08 addressed to Culture Club of Las Vegas. Address has been updated per USPS service request and remailed. 09-00705
01/20/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Briefing shall remain stayed. Motion or Stipulation to dismiss due: 30 days. 09-01452
01/26/2009Other Returned Mail. Order filed 12/5/08 addressed to Culture Club of Las Vegas. Per USPS "moved left no address". No forwarding address. 09-02078
01/29/2009Other Returned Mail. Order filed 1/20/09 addressed to Culture Club of Las Vegas. Per USPS "moved left no address". No forwarding address. 09-02513
03/17/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal as abandoned." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. 09-06676
03/20/2009Other Returned Mail. Order filed 3/17/09 addressed to Culture Club of Las Vegas. Per USPS "moved left no address, unable to forward". 09-07189
04/14/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-07198
04/14/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/20/2009Other Returned Mail. Remittitur issued 4/14/09 addressed to Culture Club of Las Vegas. Per USPS "moved left no address, unable to forward". 09-09897
04/23/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 17, 2009. 09-07198