judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEONARD (GREGORY) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY)

Case Information: 51607
Short Caption:LEONARD (GREGORY) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 31151 , 39627 , 80295
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C126285Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Cherry, DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice Cherry
None for Justice Douglas
Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/20/2009How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/12/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/12/2008OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas.
05/12/2008OtherDisqualification of Justice Cherry.
05/12/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 08-11814
05/12/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days 08-11826
05/14/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 08-12168
05/27/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-13287
05/27/2008Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certificate Pursuant to NRAP 9(a). 08-13288
09/15/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-23736
09/26/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due 11/10/08. 08-24901
11/10/2008MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion to Permit Appellant to File an Opening Brief Longer than Thirty Pages. (78 pages). 08-28634
11/10/2008BriefReceived Opening Brief. (FILED PER ORDER 11/17/08). 08-28635
11/10/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 15. 08-28640
11/17/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the 78-page opening brief received on November 10, 2008. Answering Brief due: 30 days. 08-29172
11/17/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-28635
12/22/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-32368
12/23/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: February 17, 2009. 08-32567
02/20/2009MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 50 Page Answering Brief. 09-04432
02/25/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief and appendix received on February 20, 2009. Reply Brief due: 30 days. 09-04861
02/25/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. 09-04435
02/25/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 09-04437
03/27/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (21 days). 09-07798
03/30/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: 21 days. 09-07986
04/20/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief. 09-09895
04/20/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/18/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn3[The Honorables Michael L. Douglas and Michael Cherry, Justices, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] 11-32211
11/07/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 11-34285
12/20/2011Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Fn1[The Honorables Michael L. Douglas and Michael Cherry, Justices, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] 11-39231
12/23/2011MotionFiled Request to Stay Remittitur Pending Petition for Writ of Certiorari. 11-39578
01/13/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until April 5, 2012. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by April 5, 2012, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition. If such notice is not received by April 5, 2012, the remittitur shall issue on April 6, 2012. 12-01358
04/02/2012MotionFiled Renewed Request to Stay Remittitur Pending Petition for Writ of Certiorari. 12-10405
04/04/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by June 1, 2012, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by June 1, 2012, the remittitur shall issue on June 4, 2012. 12-10684
06/04/2012RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 12-17348
06/04/2012Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
06/08/2012MotionFiled Motion to Recall Remittitur. 12-18105
06/15/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 11, 2012. 12-17348
06/27/2012Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. 12-20273