Case Information: 51617 | |||
Short Caption: | SMITH (ROBERT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 61692 , 63843 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C225451 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/13/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for Robert Fitzgerald Smith, Appellant | 08-11978 | |
05/13/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/13/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. This fast track appeal has been docketed as an electronic case. The Nevada Supreme Court Electronic Filing Pilot Program Rules and NRAP 3C govern this case. | 08-11979 | |
05/13/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Request for Rough Draft Transcript. Court Reporters: Kiara Schmidt, Joe D'Amato, Maureen Schorn, Renee Vincent and Kerry Esparza. Transcripts requested: 9/6/06, 10/11/06, 10/31/06, 11/2/06, 2/27/07, 5/8/07, 10/18/07, 2/21/08, 2/25/08, 2/26/08 and 4/9/08. | 08-11982 | |
05/15/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maureen Schorn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/31/06 and 11/2/06. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-12312 | |
05/20/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare and File Transcript. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-12680 | |
05/27/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/6/06. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-13275 | |
05/29/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/18/07, 2/21/08, 2/25/08, 2/26/08 and 4/9/08. | 08-13440 | |
06/13/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion as Moot. Because Vincent delivered the transcripts before the date the transcripts were due, we deny the motion for an extension of time as moot. | 08-15069 | |
06/17/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time | 08-15520 | |
06/26/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Court reporter D'Amato within 10 days from the date of this order shall file the requested transcripts in the district court, deliver the transcripts to counsel, and file a certificate in this court acknowledging the date of delivery. Fast track statement and appendix due: 40 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-16290 | |
08/05/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant's Motion for Full Briefing and New Briefing Schedule. | 08-20251 | |
08/22/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. We deny the motion for full briefing. Fast track statement and appendix due: 15 days. If appellant's counsel is unable to adequately address the issues she intends to raise in 10 pages, she may file a motion for leave to file a fast track statement in excess of 10 pages. | 08-21676 | |
09/08/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File 21 Page FTS | 08-23052 | |
09/10/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement and appendix received on September 8, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-23297 | |
09/10/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Fast Track Statement | 08-23298 | |
09/10/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Appellant's Appendix, Volumes 1 and 2. | 08-23299 | |
10/01/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File 20 Page Fast Track Response | 08-25327 | |
10/03/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent filed a motion for leave to file a fast track response in excess of 10 pages. The motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track response received on October 1, 2008. | 08-25596 | |
10/03/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response | 08-25598 | |
04/22/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-10055 | |
05/19/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-11567 | |
05/19/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/28/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 22, 2009. | 09-11567 | |
10/01/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to appellant Robert Smith in response to his request for copies. | 13-29293 |