Case Information: 51598 | |||
Short Caption: | REYNOLDS VS. DILLARDS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A559125 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/06/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/12/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. 07/29/08--per documents received today, filing fee waived (appellant in forma pauperis). | ||
05/12/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-11711 | |
05/13/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 08-11925 | |
05/27/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 08-13154 | |
05/27/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-13155 | |
07/01/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing District Court to rule on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. District court Order due: 30 days. Fn1[We defer ruling on appellant's request for transcripts.] | 08-16710 | |
07/29/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Documents from Dept. IV showing that in forma pauperis was granted. | 08-19497 | |
09/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due in District Court Case no. A559125. 30 days. | 08-24592 | |
10/06/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 08-25814 | |
10/06/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/09/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-00654 | |
02/03/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-01752 | |
02/03/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/12/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 9, 2009. | 09-01752 |