Case Information: 51599 | |||
Short Caption: | BEACH VS. BEACH | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV25409 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/15/2008 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/12/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Robin Wright check no. 2254. | ||
05/12/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-11715 | |
05/15/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell | 08-12284 | |
05/19/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Richard F. Cornell for Respondent. | 08-12475 | |
05/19/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Notice of Appearance of Counsel-Cornell. | 08-12477 | |
05/21/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-12794 | |
05/21/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Docketing statement (including settlement judge). Due date: 10 days. | 08-12795 | |
05/23/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -docketing statement served on settlement judge. | 08-13105 | |
05/28/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Notice of Appearance of Counsel served on settlement judge. | 08-13350 | |
07/10/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be held on 7/24/08 | 08-17529 | |
07/24/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 8/7/08 | 08-19120 | |
12/18/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 08-32172 | |
12/24/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 08-32707 | |
01/09/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 09-00702 | |
03/20/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 23, 2009. | 09-07167 | |
04/21/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Second Request. (Stipulation for Extension of Time attached) | 09-09962 | |
04/28/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension. Opening brief due May 22, 2009. | 09-10532 | |
05/22/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. (30 days). | 09-12862 | |
05/29/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. Opening Brief due: June 22, 2009. | 09-13458 | |
06/01/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 09-13583 | |
06/08/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and having reviewed the stipulation filed on June 1, 1009, this appeal is dismissed. Fn1[With respect to the parties' purported stipulation to the immediate issuance and possible recall of the remittitur, under NRAP 41 and 42 the remittitur will not be issued.] PANEL-TL. | 09-14233 | |
06/08/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |