judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

W. L. MILLER, ET AL. v. MRS. MINNIE MILLER

Case: A-2775
A-2775
06/27/1950
Application for Writ of Error
W. L. MILLER, ET AL.
MRS. MINNIE MILLER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/07/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/29/1950Brief on the MeritsRespondent
06/27/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/07/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/03/1951Concurring Opinion issued.
01/03/1951Opinion issued
10/29/1950Brief on the Merits
10/04/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/27/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. L. Miller, et al.Petitioner
Mrs. Minnie MillerRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information