judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KAIMAN VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36308
Short Caption:KAIMAN VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35910
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR991280Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/19/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/19/2000Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Certiorari. (Received original only---no copies.) 00-10487
06/21/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Copy of petition and appendix, affidavit, and service on district judge and municipal court judge. Due Date: 10 days
06/21/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption.
07/03/2000Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Certiorarari (copy of writ filed by petitioner on 6/19/00--requested by court). 00-11279
08/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Denying Petition for Writ of Certiorari. " . . . we deny this petition." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-13349
08/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On August 21, 2000, petitioner submitted a proper person motion for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing. Appellant has not been granted leave to file papers in proper person. Nevertheless, we direct the clerk of this court to file the proper person motion. We grant the motion. Petitioner shall have to and including September 8, 2000, to serve and file a petition for rehearing through counsel. 00-15075
08/28/2000MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Rehearing. 00-14626
09/14/2000MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Final Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Rehearing. 00-16235
09/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On September 14, 2000, petitioner submitted a second proper person motion for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing. Appellant has not been granted leave to file papers in proper person. Nevertheless, we direct the clerk of this court to file the proper person motion. We grant the motion. Petitioner shall have to and including October 16, 2000, to serve and file a petition for rehearing through counsel. 00-16526
09/19/2000MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Final Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Rehearing. 00-16235
10/17/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: 10/16/00 (Filed by Attorney Richard F. Cornell). 00-18403
11/20/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[Although petitioner has not been granted permission to file documents in this matter in proper person, we have received and considered petitioner's proper person documents.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-20306
12/06/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-20704
12/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.