judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSEPH KRAFCZIK, JR., Administrator of the Estate of Allan H. Krafczik v. TANAYA MOON MORRIS

Case Heading (S-08-0003)
Case Number:S-08-0003Case Docketed On:01/02/2008
Linked To: S-08-0079
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:JOSEPH KRAFCZIK, JR., Administrator of the Estate of Allan H. Krafczik v. TANAYA MOON MORRIS
Full Title:JOSEPH KRAFCZIK, JR., Administrator of the Estate of Allan H. Krafczik, Appellant (Plaintiffs), v. TANAYA MOON MORRIS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAllan H. KrafczikSteve C.M. Aron
AppellantJoseph Krafczik Jr.Steve C.M. Aron
AppellantChristine KrafczikSteve C.M. Aron
AppelleeTanaya Moon MorrisJason M. Tangeman
Stacy L. Rostad

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Guardianship, Property
Opinion Number:2009 WY 53
Citation:206 P.3d 372

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/02/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/02/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/02/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/19/2008Brief - Appellants; received copy of designation of recordBriefAppellantFinal
03/05/2008Notice-Incoming - Suggestion of death of appellant Allan H. KrafczikNotice-IncomingSuggestion of deathFinal
04/04/2008Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/04/2008Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - copy of proposed order inadvertently not included with motionNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
04/09/2008Service - Certificate of service revised to reflect hand delivery at a later date for Brief of Appellee and Motion to DismissServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
04/29/2008Order - Denying motion to dismiss and order requiring status report re: personal representativeOrderDenyFinal
04/29/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/06/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/19/2008Response/Objection - Other - appellants' report on appointment of personal representativeResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
05/29/2008Order - Other - report on appointment of personal representative and order consolidating appealsOrderOtherFinal
05/30/2008Motion - Dismiss - involuntary renewed motionMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
06/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - motion to substitute partyNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/24/2008Order - Denying motions to dismiss appeals and order granting motion to substitute party (Caption amended pursuant to order) (order file stamped with wrong date--original order corrected)OrderDenyFinal
09/15/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jason Tangeman for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - C.M. Aron for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/23/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court at the University of Wyoming (Steve C.M. Aron for appellant; Jason M. Tangeman for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/23/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/13/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/29/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/29/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/01/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 4/30/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal