Case Information: 53567 | |||
Short Caption: | BLANCHARD VS. CIRCUS CASINOS, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51029 , 53920 , 56996 , 60488 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0603096 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/08/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/08/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-08775 | |
04/13/2009 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Notice of Withdrawal | 09-09152 | |
05/26/2009 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief reguarding Disqualification of the District Judge in the Above Stated Case. | 09-12995 | |
05/26/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 09-12994 | |
07/01/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-16285 | |
07/28/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-17265 | |
07/28/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/04/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 29, 2009. | 09-17265 |