Case Information: 51621 | |||
Short Caption: | CLEVELAND (ERIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR071827 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/14/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for Erin Cleveland, Appellant | 08-12120 | |
05/14/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/14/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. This fast track appeal has been docketed as an electronic case. The Nevada Supreme Court Electronic Filing Pilot Program Rules and NRAP 3C govern this case. | 08-12132 | |
05/16/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Request for Rough Draft Transcript. Court Reporter: Captions Unlimited of Nevada. Transcript requested: 4/11/08. | 08-12327 | |
06/23/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Notice of Telephonic Extension. Fast track statement and appendix due: June 30, 2008. | 08-15961 | |
06/30/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Fast Track Statement | 08-16649 | |
06/30/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Joint Appendix Volume 1 and 2. | 08-16651 | |
07/22/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Notice of Telephonic Extension. Fast track response due: July 28, 2008. | 08-18850 | |
07/24/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response | 08-19084 | |
07/24/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Respondent's Appendix | 08-19085 | |
09/05/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED IN PART AND VACATED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-22830 | |
09/30/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-23483 | |
09/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/08/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 1, 2008. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-23483 |