Case Information: 51590 | |||
Short Caption: | MOORE (ATIBA) VS. STATE C/W 52286/53592 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 51590*, 52286 , 53592 | Related Case(s): | 43002 , 43248 , 47155 , 48112 , 52286 , 53592 , 60251 , 62352 , 62638 , 62976 , 65234 , 77181 , 77181-COA |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C195697 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Douglas | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/07/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/09/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
05/09/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/09/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-11654 | |
06/03/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-13929 | |
07/07/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. | 08-17179 | |
07/07/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
10/14/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Record on Appeal. Upon issuance of the remittitur in Docket No. 51590, the clerk of this court shall transfer the record on appeal previously filed in Docket No. 51590 to Docket No. 52286. District court clerk: 30 days from the date of this order to: (1) file and transmit a supplemental record on appeal containing all documents filed in the district court since the record on appeal was filed in this court in Docket No. 51590; or (2) inform this court in writing that no supplemental record on appeal is required as nothing was filed in the district court since the original transmission date. The supplemental record, if any, shall be filed in Docket No. 52286. The portion of our September 8, 2008, order entered in Docket No. 52286 directing the district court to transmit the record on appeal is hereby vacated. Nos. 52286/51590. | 08-26470 | |
04/30/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Entry of Written Judgment or Order in Docket No. 53592, Transmission of Supplemtnal Record on Appeal in Docket No. 53592, Consolidation of Appeals, and Vacating Portion Order in Docket No. 52286. District Court order due: 30 days. This court directs that Docket Nos. 51590,52286 and 53592 be consolidated. The court vacates its prior order to the clerk of this court to transfer the record on appeal filed in Docket No. 51590. District Court Clerk: Supplemental Record on Appeal in Docket No. 53590. Nos. 51590/62286/53592. | 09-10730 | |
06/03/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Labeled as Vol. 6. (Filed in case no. 53592). Nos. 51590/52286/53592 (09-13920). | ||
06/03/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed in district court on May 29, 2009 (filed in case no. 53592). [09-13887] | ||
11/30/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Supplemental Record (transcript of 3/27/08) due: 30 days. | 09-28902 | |
01/04/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/27/08. (Filed in 51590). Nos. 51590/52286/53592. | 10-00107 | |
01/07/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volume 7. | 10-00511 | |
02/04/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG Nos. 51590/52286/53592. | 10-03100 | |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-04215 | |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 5, 2010. | 10-04215 |