Case Information: 51587 | |||
Short Caption: | BREWER (ARTHUR) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 48014 , 50377 , 52585 , 57716 , 62643 , 76865 , 76865-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C223499 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/18/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/09/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/09/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-11646 | |
06/03/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Record on Appeal. Upon issuance of the remittitur in Docket No. 50377, this court directs the clerk of this court to transfer the record on appeal previously filed in Docket No. 50377 to Docket No. 51587. Supplemental Record due: 30 days. | 08-13966 | |
06/12/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Supplemental Record. | 08-15030 | |
11/14/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Record on Appeal. District Court Clerk: 30 days to transfer as a second volume supplemental record on appeal all documents filed in the district court since June 12, 2008. | 08-28977 | |
11/18/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 50377. | 08-29361 | |
11/18/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/24/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Supplemental Record. | 08-30000 | |
03/12/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn1 [We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in these matters, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] SNP09-RP/MD/KP. Nos. 51587/52585. | 09-06435 | |
04/07/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-07094 | |
04/07/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/14/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 9, 2009. | 09-07094 |