Case Information: 51601 | |||
Short Caption: | JOHNSTONE (GUY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 46965 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR060175 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/12/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for Guy Anthony Johnstone, Appellant | 08-11720 | |
05/12/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/12/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. This fast track appeal has been docketed as an electronic case. The Nevada Supreme Court Electronic Filing Pilot Program Rules and NRAP 3C govern this case. | 08-11722 | |
05/12/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Request for Rough Draft Transcript. Court Reporter: I. Zihn. Transcripts requested: 4/8/08. | 08-11727 | |
06/16/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Fast Track Statement | 08-15338 | |
06/16/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix | 08-15339 | |
07/08/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response | 08-17278 | |
09/05/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the amended judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-22839 | |
09/30/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-23481 | |
09/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/08/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 1, 2008. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-23481 |