Case Information: 51592 | |||
Short Caption: | FRONT SIGHT ENTERPRISES, INC. VS. DISTRICT COURT (VALENCIA) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 54751 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A544540 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/09/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
05/09/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition. | 08-11669 | |
05/09/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Petitioners' Appendix. | 08-11670 | |
05/09/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 08-11671 | |
05/19/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Newman Morrris - check no. 13302. | ||
06/12/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] NNP08-WM/MC/NS | 08-15012 | |
07/02/2008 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Motion for Reconsideration of Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, Writ of Prohibition. | 08-16870 | |
07/02/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 10 days. | 08-16873 | |
07/10/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Newman Morris & Dachelet. | ||
10/01/2008 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 08-25396 | |
10/28/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-26244 | |
10/28/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |