Case Information: 51584 | |||
Short Caption: | GRAHAM (LESLIE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 31192 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C135930 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Gibbons | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Hardesty for Justice Gibbons | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/01/2008 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/09/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Gibbons. | ||
05/09/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/09/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 08-11640 | |
05/22/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-12949 | |
05/22/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/16/02, 8/13/07, 12/19/97, 1/28/08, 3/6/08. To Court Reporter: Kristine Cornelius and Bev Sigurnik. | 08-12950 | |
07/17/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Beverly Sigurnik and Kristine Cornelius to file certificate of delivery of transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | 08-18340 | |
07/29/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Beverly Sigurnik stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/16/02, 8/13/07, 12/19/07, 1/28/08, 3/5/08. | 08-19523 | |
09/05/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-22942 | |
09/05/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 08-22943 | |
10/08/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-25961 | |
12/01/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. No Reply Brief filed. | ||
04/30/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-JH/MC/NS. | 09-10769 | |
05/26/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-12217 | |
05/26/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/04/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 1, 2009. | 09-12217 |