judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

G & J UPDATE, LLC VS. CORCOM, INC.

Case Information: 53569
Short Caption:G & J UPDATE, LLC VS. CORCOM, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 53661
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A570720Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/10/2009 / Saint-Aubin, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/08/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Dean Y. Kajioka Esq. check no. 8120.
04/08/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-08804
04/08/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days 09-08805
04/10/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin 09-09009
04/15/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 09-09489
04/15/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Case Appeal Statement. 09-09490
04/23/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Case Appeal Statement served on Settlement Judge. 09-10141
05/01/2009MotionFiled Motion. G&J Update LLC's Motion Requesting Determination of the District Court's Jurisdiction of District Court Case A570720, Pending Appeal. 09-10894
05/04/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due Date: 10 days (Amended Findings of Fact 2/27/09) 09-11001
05/05/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 10 days 09-11155
05/08/2009MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 09-11426
05/08/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 09-11430
05/08/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 09-11454
05/11/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-11518
05/11/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. fn1[We defer ruling on appellants' motion requesting this court to address the district court's jurisdiction, filed on May 1, 2009, pending resolution of the issues in this order to show cause.] 09-11532
05/12/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. Corcom, Inc.'s Opposition to G&J Update LLC's Motion Requesting Determination of the District Court's Jurisdiction of District Court Case A570720 Pending Appeal. 09-11726
05/12/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -Corcom, Inc.'s Opposition to G&J Update LLC's Motion Requesting Determination of the District Court's Jurisdiction of District Court Case A570720 Pending Appeal. 09-11728
05/13/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal served on Settlement Judge. 09-11827
05/13/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Respondent's Corcom, Inc.'s Opposition to G&J Update LLC's Motion Requesting Determination of the District Court's Jurisdiction of District Court Case A570720 Pending Appeal. 09-11830
05/19/2009MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response. 09-12447
05/20/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 09-12600
05/20/2009MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Supplement to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 09-12602
05/20/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 09-12603
05/20/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Respondent's Supplement to Motion to Dismiss Appeal.. 09-12604
05/27/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/09/09, 01/12/09, and 01/15/09. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins. 09-13106
05/27/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the program because there is a potential jurisdictional defect and a number of procedural issues must be sorted through before the case is ripe for mediation. 09-13153
05/28/2009Settlement Order/Procedural Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. Briefing and requesting of transcripts shall remain suspended pending resolution of respondent's motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. 09-13321
05/29/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Supplement to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 09-13375
06/03/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of the Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal served upon Settlement Judge Saint-Aubin. 09-13780
06/08/2009Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Amended Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order filed in the district court February 27, 2009. 09-14302
06/30/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." Fn1 [In light of our dismissal of this appeal, we deny as moot appellant's motion requesting a determination of the district court's jurisdiction pending the appeal.] SNP09-RP/MD/KP. 09-16139
07/28/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-17253
07/28/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/06/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 30, 2009. 09-17253