Case Information: 51585 | |||
Short Caption: | MABRY (DARIUS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C241230 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/09/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/09/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-11642 | |
06/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-15664 | |
06/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Court Reporter Renee Vincent. | 08-15680 | |
06/26/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motions. Court Reporter Renee Vincent's Certificate of Delivery due: July 16, 2008. Transcript Request Form due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: August 15, 2008. | 08-16296 | |
07/08/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/03/08 and 4/04/08. | 08-17348 | |
08/18/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-21243 | |
08/21/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: September 15, 2008. | 08-21632 | |
09/17/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Received Fast Track Statement. (FILED PER ORDER 09/25/08). | 08-24006 | |
09/17/2008 | Appendix | Received Appendix. Appellant's Fast Track Appendix. (FILED PER ORDER 09/25/08). | 08-24007 | |
09/22/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Appellant's Motion for Leave to File a Twelve Page Fast Track Statement. | 08-24426 | |
09/25/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix received on September 17, 2008. | 08-24756 | |
09/25/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-24006 | |
09/25/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 08-24007 | |
10/17/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-26821 | |
05/21/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. "ORDER the judgment of conviction for robbery AFFIRMED and the judgment of conviction for consipiracy to commit robbery REVERSED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG GIBBONS, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. | 09-12625 | |
06/16/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-13948 | |
06/16/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/22/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 18, 2009. | 09-13948 | |
10/02/2009 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. US District Court Appeal. (No action required.) | 09-24161 | |
10/05/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to appellant Darius Mabry. No action will be taken on his Notice of Appeal to the US District Court. | 09-24210 |