judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBECK VS. LUNAS CONST. CLEAN-UP

Case Information: 53576
Short Caption:ROBECK VS. LUNAS CONST. CLEAN-UPCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A519529Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/18/2009 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/11/2011How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/09/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Steven L. Day. P.C. check no. 4354.
04/09/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-08975
04/14/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost 09-09321
04/27/2009MotionFiled Motion. 09-10370
04/27/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -Motion to Withdraw. 09-10372
04/27/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-10376
04/27/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (Docketing Statement) 09-10378
05/04/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. -Docketing Statement Civil Appeals and Motion to Withdraw. 09-11030
05/11/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion of Steven Day to withdraw as counsel for appellant. Appellant: 30 days to retain new counsel. Timelines for Early Case Assessment Report and Final Settlement Conference Status Report are stayed. 09-11616
05/15/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/10/09 09-12138
05/18/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Filed by attorney Steven Day w/ Cohen Johnson & Day.) 09-12323
05/18/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (Amended) (Filed by attorney Steven Day w/ Cohen Johnson & Day.) 09-12324
05/27/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Entry of Order. 09-13156
07/09/2009Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. From David Robeck who will be representing himself in this appeal. 09-16605
07/20/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This appeal should be removed from the program because appellant has not been able to obtain new counsel 09-17729
07/24/2009Settlement Order/Procedural Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Assigning Appeal to Pilot Program for Civil Proper Person Appeals. Appellant: Proper Person Appeal Statement Due: 40 days. 09-18117
08/20/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Leslie Mark Stovall, Esq. 09-20261
08/20/2009MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Remove Appeal from Pilot Program for Civil Proper Person Appeals and Reset Briefing Schedule. 09-20263
09/02/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents Lunas Construction, Inc. and Orlando Collins' Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Remove Appeal from Pilot Program for Civil Proper Person Appeals and Reset Briefing Schedule. 09-21394
09/10/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to Show Cause, Granting Motion to Remove Appeal from Pilot Program, and Deferring Ruling on Motion to Set Briefing Schedule. Appellant need not file the civil proper person appeal statement. Response from appellant due 30 days. 09-22013
10/13/2009MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 09-24925
11/13/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Placing Appeal in Settlement Program. Jurisdiction over this appeal is proper. We deny appellant's motion to set a briefing schedule. We direct the clerk to issue an assignment notice placing this appeal in the settlement program. 09-27654
11/18/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost 09-28110
12/14/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 1/11/10 09-30242
01/14/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 10-01217
01/21/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. Transcript Request Form due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. 10-01787
02/04/2010Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certificate That Our Office Already Has The Transcripts 10-03133
04/21/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 10-10416
04/21/2010Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion/stipulation to enlarge time to file opening brief is approved. Due date: May 5, 2010. 10-10417
05/07/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. 10-12003
05/07/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included. Vols. 1 through 3. 10-12004
06/07/2010BriefFiled Answering Brief. 10-14583
06/07/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 10-14584
11/24/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Reply Brief or Notice of Election not to file a Reply Brief. Due Date: 15 days. 10-30756
12/13/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Election Not to File a Reply Brief. 10-32365
05/11/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument. 11-14015
05/11/2011Case Status UpdateSubmitted for Decision.
05/27/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." 11-15714
05/27/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Other. Health Information Privacy referred to in Order of Affirmance. 11-15733
06/21/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 11-18402
06/21/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
07/08/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 30, 2011. 11-18402