Case Information: 53578 | |||
Short Caption: | BERRY, SR. VS. BERRY, JR. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 57111 , 57939 , 63604 , 65525 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A508042 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/09/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/09/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-08984 | |
04/20/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 09-09824 | |
04/23/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-10150 | |
09/03/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. | 09-21433 | |
09/29/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-22541 | |
09/29/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/30/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 9/03/09 addressed to Mario Berry. Per USPS, "Return to Sender, Unable to Forward". | 09-23881 | |
10/07/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2009. | 09-22541 |