Case Information: 53566 | |||
Short Caption: | BLACK EAGLE CONSULTING VS. NICHOLS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0700418 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/09/2009 / Berkson, Lester | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/08/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Marquis & Aurbach check no. 094051. | ||
04/08/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-08774 | |
04/09/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson | 09-08979 | |
04/15/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 4/20/09 | 09-09481 | |
04/17/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-09724 | |
04/17/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is scheduled for 5/20/09 | 09-09739 | |
05/27/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 09-13141 | |
06/15/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 30 days. | 09-14781 | |
07/13/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 09-17165 | |
07/13/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Appellants' Motion to Withdraw Appeal. | 09-17166 | |
07/20/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. on Settlement Judge. (Appellant's Motion to withdraw Appeal.) | 09-17700 | |
07/22/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH | 09-17937 | |
07/22/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |