Case Information: 51615 | |||
Short Caption: | MARIS VS. WESTERN PRIDE CONSTR. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A510516 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/16/2008 / Haberfeld, Stephen | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/13/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Barry Levinson check no. 1057. | ||
05/13/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-11898 | |
05/16/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen Haberfeld | 08-12384 | |
06/05/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-14246 | |
06/05/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -Docketing Statement. | 08-14247 | |
06/10/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 7/25/08 | 08-14651 | |
06/13/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -docketing statement served on settlement judge. | 08-15155 | |
07/29/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case continues to be appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 08-19521 | |
08/05/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case continued to be appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is rescheduled for 9/4/08. | 08-20207 | |
09/10/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. | 08-23356 | |
10/07/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 08-25876 | |
10/13/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-26343 | |
10/30/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/08/08. To Court Reporter: Yvette Lester. | 08-27885 | |
01/14/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 12, 2009. | 09-01102 | |
02/17/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 09-04070 | |
02/17/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. | ||
02/27/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. | 09-05137 | |
03/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to obtain substitute counsel and to cause counsel to enter an appearance in this court or inform this court if appellant does not intend to obtain new counsel. | 09-05871 | |
03/18/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Entry of Order Re: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record. | 09-06896 | |
04/15/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Appellant Richard Maris. | 09-09468 | |
04/15/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Notice of Bankruptcy Filing of Appellant Richard Maris. Due date: 10 days. | 09-09470 | |
04/23/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Bankruptcy Filing on Appellant Richard Maris. | 09-10117 | |
05/20/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss the appeal. . ." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-12541 | |
06/16/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-13909 | |
06/16/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/22/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 18, 2009. | 09-13909 |