Case Information: 51606 | |||
Short Caption: | MOYES VS. DIST. CT. (STATE, CHILD & FAMILY SERVICES) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - JV3386 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/12/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/12/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Petition for Writ of Mandate and Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. | 08-11816 | |
05/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Answer. Due: 20 days. | 08-13120 | |
06/12/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. | 08-15054 | |
07/02/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Supplement. Real Party in Interest's Supplement: due 15 days. | 08-16801 | |
07/16/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Supplement to Petition for Writ. Supplement to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 08-18272 | |
09/05/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "We deny the petition." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 08-22903 | |
09/30/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-23509 | |
09/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |