Case Information: 51605 | |||
Short Caption: | AQUINO (REYNALDO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 56873 , 57044 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 07C229242-1 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/12/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for Reynaldo Aquino, Appellant | 08-11760 | |
05/12/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/12/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. This fast track appeal has been docketed as an electronic case. The Nevada Supreme Court Electronic Filing Pilot Program Rules and NRAP 3C govern this case. | 08-11761 | |
05/12/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Request for Rough Draft Transcript. Court Reporters: Kiara Schmidt and Richard Kangas. Transcripts requested: 1/11/07, 2/1/07, 4/11/07, 7/18/07, 9/12/07, 1/30/08, 2/4/08, 2/5/08 and 4/2/08. | 08-11764 | |
05/27/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/11/07. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-13278 | |
05/27/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/1/07. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-13280 | |
05/30/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (submitted by Richard Kangas) (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-13667 | |
06/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time for Fast Track Statement | 08-15676 | |
06/24/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the notice of delivery of transcripts received on June 17, 2008. Appellant shall have until August 19, 2008, to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-16099 | |
06/24/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Richard Kangas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/11/07, 7/18/07, 7/20/07, 9/12/07, 1/30/08, 2/4/08, 2/5/08 and 4/2/08. | 08-15408 | |
08/20/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension | 08-21419 | |
08/21/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Fast Track Statement | 08-21552 | |
08/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File 12 Page FTS | 08-21553 | |
08/21/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 08-21554 | |
08/21/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. 12-page fast track statement approved. | 08-21660 | |
08/25/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Appellant's Sealed Portions of Appendix. | 08-21841 | |
08/27/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement is granted. Fn1[Appellant's fast track statement was filed on August 21, 2008.] | 08-22126 | |
09/10/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response | 08-23393 | |
06/18/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-15169 | |
07/07/2009 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. (Appellant). | 09-16685 | |
09/24/2009 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 09-23329 | |
10/20/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-24066 | |
10/20/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/29/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 23, 2009. | 09-24066 |