judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLLINS (RONALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36309
Short Caption:COLLINS (RONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C158146Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/13/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/20/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/20/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10508
07/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the record on appeal due: 120 days. Record must include any previously prepared transcripts. fn2[The record shall not include exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-12398
07/31/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on June 20, 2000. 00-13227
07/31/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from District Judge Lee Gates enclosing copy of order filed June 20, 2000. 00-13229
11/13/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 11/09/00. 00-19835
11/13/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/22/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having reviewed the record on appeal, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-03305
03/20/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-03720
03/20/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 28, 2001. 01-03720