judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GLENN GRIFFITH DAX v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0004)
Case Number:S-08-0004Case Docketed On:01/03/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:GLENN GRIFFITH DAX v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:GLENN GRIFFITH DAX, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGlenn Griffith Dax Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 52
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/03/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/19/2008Motion - Other - Motion to withdraw as counsel.MotionOtherFinal
02/19/2008Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
02/19/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/19/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion to withdrawEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/19/2008Record - Received unfiled recordRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
03/11/2008Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdraw, conditionally affirming judgment and sentenceOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
04/28/2008Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
05/07/2008Opinion - Published order - Order affirming the judgment and sentence of the District CourtOpinionPublished orderFinal
05/12/2008Service - Mail returned. Copy of order mailed to last known address of Glenn Giffith Dax returned, stamped "inmate no longer here".ServiceMail returnedFinal
05/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/23/2008Record - Returned unfiled recordRecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
05/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/23/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/28/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/27/08 by Michelle Crotteau.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
06/18/2010Correspondence - Incoming. Received request from Mr. Dax for copies of file. Sent this date with copy of docket page.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal