judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAVON THOMAS HENSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1177
Short Caption:JAVON THOMAS HENSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-2143-10Filed Date:09/15/2010

Opening Event Date:09/15/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/02/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:11/22/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/07/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/26/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJavon Henson YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
David B. GoodhandYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/04/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
12/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (71 pgs/Maar) 5/11/10 proc.
12/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (12 pgs/tape) 7/13/10 proc. w/cd
12/02/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo).
01/25/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 18, 2011. (JAC)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. NO OPPO
04/21/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 18, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
07/01/2011RECORD INDEX
07/01/2011RECORD COPIES
07/15/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief for 90 days(Appellant)
07/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to 10/17/11.
10/11/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/11/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
11/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - until November 25, 2011 (Appellee)
11/16/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 11/25/11.
11/22/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
11/22/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
02/10/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
05/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/25/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)
05/30/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
05/30/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
06/07/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, *Blackburne-Rigsby, King
11/15/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and king, Senior Judge.)
11/29/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
12/04/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's Motion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc to January 8, 2013.
01/08/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc. (Appellant)Granted
01/10/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to February 19, 2013.
02/19/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
04/25/2013FiledOrdered that appellee, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response (ten copies) thereto.
05/31/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellee)
06/05/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file a response on or before June 28, 2013.
06/27/2013FiledOpposition to appellant's petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellee)
02/10/2014FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
02/26/2014FiledMandate
03/14/2014FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)