Case Information: 51588 | |||
Short Caption: | PITTS (KEVIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51175 , 51212 , 51589 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C221415 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/09/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/09/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-11648 | |
06/02/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due from Appellant: 20 days. | 08-13784 | |
06/16/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Dated June 2, 2008. | 08-15284 | |
07/15/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP08-WM/MC/NS | 08-18127 | |
07/31/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/31/06, 11/1/06, 2/8/07. | 08-19968 | |
08/12/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-19798 | |
08/12/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/20/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 14, 2008. | 08-19798 |