Case Information: 51589 | |||
Short Caption: | PITTS (KEVIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51175 , 51212 , 51588 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C221415 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/09/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/09/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/09/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-11651 | |
06/03/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Record. Due 90 days. | 08-13968 | |
07/09/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 8. | 08-17456 | |
07/09/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/04/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. Due: 40 days. Fn1[The court reporter is not required to provide the proper prseon litigant copies of any transcripts.] | 09-21650 | |
09/15/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/28/09. | 09-22358 | |
10/26/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 9 and 10. | 09-26099 | |
10/28/2009 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 6/22/06. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. | 09-26452 | |
11/09/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volume 11. | 09-27311 | |
12/09/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-29776 | |
01/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-00017 | |
01/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/15/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 12, 2010. | 10-00017 |