Case Information: 51596 | |||
Short Caption: | IBEABUCHI VS. CHESNOFF | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 47261 , 57794 , 63222 , 66855 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A517292 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/12/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/12/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-11708 | |
07/14/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal." NNP08-WM/MC/NS | 08-17925 | |
08/08/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-19779 | |
08/08/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/15/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2008. | 08-19779 |