judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

St Tammany, Louisiana Court Record

Case Summary

Division D
Case Summary
Case No. 512056
STATE OF LOUISIANA VS. HARRIS, NICOLAS KEELEY
Location:
Division D
Location
Division D
Judicial Officer:
Garcia, Peter J.
Judicial Officer
Garcia, Peter J.
Filed on:
10/03/2011
Filed on
10/03/2011

Case Information

Case Type: Adult Felony
Case Status:
09/11/2015 Disposed
10/03/2011 Filed
Offense Statute Degree Offense Date Filed Date
1.
POSSESSION OF SCHEDULE I
Statute
40:966 C
Degree
F
Offense Date
08/19/2011
Filed Date
10/03/2011
1.
POSSESSION OF SCHEDULE I
Statute
40:966 C
Degree
F
Offense Date
08/19/2011
Filed Date
10/03/2011
Arrest
Date:
08/19/2011
Agency:
STPSO - St. Tammany Parish Sheriff's Office

Assignment Information

Current Case Assignment
Case Number
512056
Court
Division D
Date Assigned
10/03/2011
Judicial Officer
Garcia, Peter J.

Party Information

State
STATE OF LOUISIANA
OUBRE, JOSEPH
Retained
985-778-0898(F)
504-554-9633(W)
373 MEMPHIS TRACE DR
COVINGTON, LA 70433
Defendant
HARRIS, NICOLAS KEELEY
Male
Height:
5′ 8″
Weight:
180
DOB:
03/12/1993
MASINTER, MILTON P.
Retained
504-813-9012(W)
533 BEAU CHENE DR
MANDEVILLE, LA 70471

Case Events

03/28/2018
**LUCO 2017
Report: State of Louisiana Uniform Commitment Order Judicial District: 22ND JDC Court Section: Division D Parish of Commitment: ST. TAMMANY Docket #: 512056 A. DEFENDANT / CASE IDENTIFIERSName of Defendant: NICOLAS KEELEY HARRIS DOB:03/12/1993SID NUMBER: 2735366RACE:WSEX:MB. SENTENCE Select: Original Amended Habitual Charges: (Revised Statute & Offense)(2) Number of Counts Verdict Plea/NP Modifiers(5) Total Sentence Length(6) Yr/Month/DayAmount of Time in DPS&C Custody (7) Yr/Month/DayAmount of Time to be served without benefit, if applicable. (8) 1 40:966C ONE (1) PLEA FIVE (5) YEARS FIVE (5) YEARS 2 3 4 5C. SENTENCE/OFFENSE DATES (MM/DD/YYYY) (For each of the above numerated convictions) Offense Date (1) Disposition Date Sentence Date Date sentenced as an Habitual Offender as Per RS 15:529.1 Date Original Sentence Vacated Revocation Date 108/19/2011 09/11/2015 09/11/2015 03/28/2018 2 3 4 5 D. SENTENCE CONDITIONS: ( Check all that apply ) YES NO This sentence shall be concurrent with any or every sentence the offender is now serving (1)If no to D 1, thenDocket Number(s) / ChargesParish(es), Judicial District(s) of Docket Numbers(s)Concurrent withConsecutive toXUnder the provision of C.Cr.P Art 880, defendant is given credit for time servedUnder the provisions of C.Cr.P. Art 890.1 this is a waiver of mandatory minimum sentence (excludes R.S. 12:2(B) & R.S. 15:541 et seq offenses)This defendant is subject to a multiple bill/habitual offender proceeding. (as per R.S. 15:529.1)This defendant is sentenced in accordance with R.S. 13:5401 to participate in Reentry Court.The defendant is ordered to report to start serving his sentence on : (mm/dd/yyyy)The Defendant is ordered to report to start serving a probation sentence upon the conclusion of his hard labor sentence (split sentence)Under the provisions of C.Cr.P. Art 895 and R.S. 15:542, et Seq., the defendant shall comply with the Sex Offender Registration statutes.E. REFFERRALS TO DPS&C: (Check all that apply)Recommended for Substance Use Disorder Treatment Screening (1)Recommended for Mental Health Evaluation (2)Recommended for Intensive incarceration (3)Recommended for Immediate Screening for Eligibility for Transitional Work Program Assignment (4)Comments: Court orders the defendant to complete the Stephen Hoyle Program. Court retains jurisdictions under the provisions of Article 881.1 of the Louisiana Code of Criminal Procedure and will allow for reconsideration of sentence by this Court. F. INVOLVED PARTIESMinute Clerk: DAKOTA KINGCourt Reporter: BETH CANNONProsecutor: BLAIR ALFORDDefense Attorney: DAVID CRAIGAddress: 701 N. COLUMBIA STREET COVINGTON, LA. 70433Address:402 N JEFFERSON COVINGTON, LA 70433The above sentence, handed down in Open Court, is the order of this Court and this shall be sufficient warrant for its execution. Thus Done and Signed this day of , 20 . Judge's Signature Judge's Printed Name and Address PETER J. GARCIA 701 N. COLUMBIA STREET COVINGTON, LA. 70433 Revised 11.7.2017 Reported: Y; Size: LEGAL; Copies: 1;
Created:
04/25/2019 4:35 PM
10/03/2011
Surety Bond
Surety Posted = True; BOND #0401226 BOND #0401227
Filing Party:
Defendant HARRIS, NICOLAS KEELEY
Created:
04/25/2019 4:37 PM

Dispositions

03/28/2018
Sentence
1. POSSESSION OF SCHEDULE I
Felony Sentence
Confinement and Probation
Start Date: 03/28/2018
Agency: Louisiana Department of Corrections
Sentence Term: 5 Years, 0 Months, 0 Days
Created:
04/26/2019 1:51 AM
09/11/2015
Disposition
1. POSSESSION OF SCHEDULE I
Plead Guilty (Guilty Plea)
Created:
04/26/2019 1:51 AM

Hearings

03/28/2018
Revocation (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: Garcia, Peter J.)
Held
Created:
04/26/2019 3:09 AM
02/24/2016
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: Garcia, Peter J.)
Held
Created:
04/26/2019 3:09 AM
10/15/2015
Drug Court (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: Penzato, Allison H.)
Continued Without Date
Created:
04/26/2019 3:09 AM
09/11/2015
Arraignment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: Garcia, Peter J.)
Held
Created:
04/26/2019 3:09 AM
07/16/2012
Motion Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: Garcia, Peter J.)
Held
Created:
04/26/2019 3:09 AM
05/08/2012
Motion Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: Garcia, Peter J.)
Continued
Created:
04/26/2019 3:09 AM
03/27/2012
Motion Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: Garcia, Peter J.)
Continued
Created:
04/26/2019 3:09 AM
10/05/2011
Arraignment (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer: Garcia, Peter J.)
Held
Created:
04/26/2019 3:09 AM

Other Documents

10/03/2011
Not Public Document
DEFENDANTS BOND
6 Pages

10/11/2011
Not Public Document
ORDER
1 Pages

10/13/2011
Not Public Document
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JUDGMENT
1 Pages

10/13/2011
Not Public Document
LETTER OF JUDGMENT OF BOND FORFEITURE
1 Pages

10/05/2011
Not Public Document
JUDGMENT
1 Pages

10/05/2011
Not Public Document
ATTACHMENT
1 Pages

10/20/2011
Not Public Document
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN
1 Pages

10/05/2011
Not Public Document
JUDGMENT
1 Pages

10/13/2011
Not Public Document
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT
1 Pages

03/08/2012
Not Public Document
ASSIGNMENT NOTICE
1 Pages

03/01/2012
Not Public Document
SET ASIDE BOND FORFEITURE MOTION
4 Pages

10/26/2011
Not Public Document
RETURNED MAIL
2 Pages

03/28/2012
Not Public Document
ASSIGNMENT NOTICE
1 Pages

03/21/2012
Not Public Document
CONTINUANCE MOTION
2 Pages

05/14/2012
Not Public Document
ASSIGNMENT NOTICE
1 Pages

05/14/2012
Not Public Document
RESET HEARING MOTION
2 Pages

10/03/2011
Not Public Document
INFORMATION BILL
2 Pages

09/22/2015
Not Public Document
PROBATION CHECKLIST
1 Pages

11/09/2015
Not Public Document
CONDITIONS OF PROBATION
2 Pages

11/10/2015
Not Public Document
DRUG COURT ELIGIBILITY FORM
1 Pages

09/11/2015
Not Public Document
DRUG COURT SUMMONS
1 Pages

09/11/2015
Not Public Document
DEFENDANTS PERSONAL SERVICE
1 Pages

09/11/2015
Not Public Document
JAIL SLIP
1 Pages

09/11/2015
Not Public Document
DEFENDANTS WAIVER OF RIGHTS
1 Pages

09/11/2015
Not Public Document
DISCOVERY RECEIPT
1 Pages

11/30/2015
Not Public Document
JAIL SLIP
1 Pages

12/04/2015
Not Public Document
JAIL SLIP
1 Pages

02/18/2016
Not Public Document
SHERIFF RETURN
2 Pages

02/04/2016
Not Public Document
STATE WITNESS SUMMONS
1 Pages

02/04/2016
Not Public Document
SHADOW TRACK NOTIFICATION
1 Pages

02/04/2016
Not Public Document
NOTICE TO DEFENDANT/SURETY
1 Pages

02/04/2016
Not Public Document
ASSIGNMENT NOTICE
1 Pages

02/02/2016
Not Public Document
STATUS HEARING MOTION
1 Pages

06/10/2016
Not Public Document
WARRANT
1 Pages

04/21/2017
Not Public Document
PETITION FOR CAUSE
2 Pages

07/07/2017
Not Public Document
WARRANT
2 Pages

03/28/2018
Not Public Document
UNIFORM COMMITMENT DOCUMENT
1 Pages

03/22/2018
Not Public Document
WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS
1 Pages

03/21/2018
Not Public Document
STATE WITNESS SUMMONS
1 Pages

03/21/2018
Not Public Document
SHERIFF LETTER FOR SERVICE
1 Pages

03/21/2018
Not Public Document
NOTICE TO DEFENDANT/SURETY
1 Pages

03/21/2018
Not Public Document
REVOCATION HEARING NOTICE
1 Pages

03/16/2018
Not Public Document
PROBATION HEARING MOTION
2 Pages

04/05/2018
Not Public Document
SHERIFF RETURN
2 Pages

04/03/2018
Not Public Document
PROBATION CHECKLIST
1 Pages

04/03/2018
Not Public Document
PEN PACK CHECKLIST
1 Pages