judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VALENZUELA (JUAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34830
Short Caption:VALENZUELA (JUAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40839
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C153809Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/27/2001How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/15/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/15/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-08702
10/13/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Young's Motion for Extension of Time to File his Docketing Statement. 99-09936
10/14/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on October 7, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-09988
10/14/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-09687
11/17/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. 99-11380
11/23/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. May 4, 1999; May 5, 1999; May 6, 1999; May 11, 1999, May 27, 1999; and July 15, 1999 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Robert Mintun. 99-11709
12/27/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of time to Prepare Transcript. Court Reporter Robert Mintun. 99-13149
01/06/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Valenzuela's Motion for Extension of time to File His Opening Brief. 00-00203
01/20/2000TranscriptReceived Transcript. Proceedings: May 4, 5, 6, 11 & 27, 1999; and July 15, 1999.. Court Reporter: Robert H. Mintun. 00-00919
02/18/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The motions filed December 27, 1999, and January 6, 2000, are granted. The transcripts provisionally received on January 20, 2000, shall be filed forthwith. Appellant shall, within 30 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-02608
02/18/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. May 4, 1999; May 5, 1999; May 6, 1999; May 11, 1999, May 27, 1999, and July 15, 1999 Court Reporter: Robert Mintun. 00-00919
03/17/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-04255
03/20/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for motion for extension of time/opening brief. 00-04388
04/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Brief due: June 15, 2000. No further extensions of time absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 00-06588
06/07/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/04/99 and 01/28/99. To Court Reporter: Robert Mintun. 00-09614
06/15/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Third Request) 00-10203
07/07/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 4, 1999. Court Reporter: Robert Mintun. 00-11639
07/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant appellant's unopposed motion. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file his opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). No further extensions of time shall per permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 00-12263
07/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Fourth Request) 00-13103
08/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On July 28, 2000, appellant filed a fourth motion for an extension of time to file his opening brief and appendix. We grant appellant's unopposed motion. Appellant shall have to and including September 4, 2000, to file his opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. On June 7, 2000, appellant filed a transcript request form. Because no proceedings were held on April 4, 1999, it appears that the April 4, 1999, date was an error and that appellant intended to request transcripts for proceedings held on May 4, 1999. Unless appellant submits a writing informing this court otherwise within ten (10) days from the date of this order, we will assume that the requested transcript is for proceedings held on May 4, 1999. To date, the transcripts requested for proceedings held on January 28, 1999, have not been filed. Court reporter Mintun shall have fifteen (15) days from the date of this order to file and serve the requested transcripts, to file a motion for an extension of time to do so, or to inform this court in writing why the requested transcripts cannot be produced. 00-15084
09/06/2000MotionFiled Motion. Appellant Valenzuela's Motion for Extension of Time to file Supplement to his Opening Brief. 00-15679
09/06/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 9/5/00. 00-15680
09/06/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-15681
09/29/2000MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Voluntary Statement's of Kevin McGrath Contained in Appellant's Appendix. 00-17203
09/29/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-17229
09/29/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-17231
10/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's supplemental opening brief shall be filed and served within 30 days from the date of this order. Respondent shall have 30 days from the filing of the supplemental opening brief to file a supplemental answering brief. Thereafter, appellant shall have 30 days to file a single reply brief. Court reporter Mintun shall file the transcripts for proceedings held on January 28, 1999, within 10 days from the date of this order or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against him. 00-17688
10/16/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Robert H. Mintun in response to order filed on October 5, 2000. 00-18346
11/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant respondent's 9/29/00 motion. The clerk of this court shall strike from appellant's appendix the voluntary statements of Kevin McGrath contained at pages 6-34 in Appellant's Appendix. 00-19459
11/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We vacate those portions of our August 28, 2000, and October 5, 2000, orders directing court reporter Robert H. Mintun to file and serve the transcript for proceedings conducted on January 28, 1999. We infer that no additional transcripts are needed and we deem all transcripts necessary for this appeal to be filed with this court. 00-19461
11/06/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Valenzuela's Motion for Extension of Time to Supplement his Opening Brief. 00-19514
11/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant appellant's motion for an extension of time to file and serve a supplemental opening brief. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the supplemental opening brief. 00-19706
11/13/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Michael V. Cristalli regarding transcripts. 00-19853
01/17/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has not filed a supplemental opening brief. Accordingly, no supplemental opening brief or supplemental answering brief shall be filed in this matter. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief. Failure to timely file a reply brief may be treated as an election not to file a reply. 01-01032
02/21/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Valenzuela's Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief. 01-03217
03/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until March 19, 2001, to file and serve the reply brief. We do not expect further requests for extensions of time absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. We admonish appellant's counsel for not specifying the length of the extension requested. 01-04387
03/20/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request). 01-04890
03/23/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Motion for Extension of Time/Reply Brief. 01-05154
04/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the reply brief. We caution appellant that failure to timely comply with this order may be treated as an election not to file a reply brief. 01-05817
05/18/2001Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
12/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-21770
12/27/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/13/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP02M-WM/DA/ML 02-04523
04/09/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-04645
04/09/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/23/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 11, 2002. 02-04645