judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TRENT BREON DEAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0017)
Case Number:S-08-0017Case Docketed On:01/28/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:TRENT BREON DEAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TRENT BREON DEAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTrent Breon DeanDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 124
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/28/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/29/2008Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
03/17/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/17/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/23/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/24/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/12/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/16/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/19/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, jury instructions & verdict; Volume III, transcripts; Volume IV, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/20/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk A. Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/18/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Allan Morgan, Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/18/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/08/2008Event - Phone Call to Clerk of the District Court requesting exhibitsEventPhone CallFinal
09/09/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one requested additional volume. Volume V, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/10/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/31/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/31/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/07/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/06/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal