judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEON T. BONNER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1186
Short Caption:KEON T. BONNER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-3284-09Filed Date:09/20/2010

Opening Event Date:09/20/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/15/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/18/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKeon T. Bonner YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/07/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Isaac C. Trouth, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/07/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Isaac C. Trouth, Esquire
10/15/2010LETTER from counsel for aplt stating that he will be unable to fulfill the CJA panel duties after being appointed as a Duputy Prosecutor in Maryland
11/03/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that the appointment of Isaac C. Trouth, Esquire, is hereby vacated, and Joanne Vasco, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant herein. F/O that newly-appointed counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (ETW)
11/18/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (89 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 6/10/10 proc.
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (162 pgs/McCarn) 6/15/10 proc.
12/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (9 pgs/Johnson) 6/16/10 proc. w/cd
12/15/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/17/2010RECORD INDEX
12/17/2010RECORD COPIES
12/17/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (pleadings---SEALED)
12/20/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
02/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 2, 2011. (JAC)
04/13/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/13/2011APPENDIX
05/12/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/16/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance
07/27/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance/Reversal
07/27/2011FiledAffirmed
08/10/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
08/18/2011FiledMandate