Case Information: 55364 | |||
Short Caption: | BURRIOLA (ANTHONY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34844 , 41298 , 44015 , 62155 , 62583 , 69568 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C143171 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/12/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/03/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-02904 | |
02/03/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/17/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. | 10-04185 | |
03/12/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order/Judgment filed in district court on 2/25/10. | 10-06591 | |
04/12/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 8. | 10-09444 | |
04/12/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/07/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn5[We have received the motion for enlargment of time, and no good cause appearing, we deny the motion.] SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-11866 | |
06/01/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-12650 | |
06/01/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/14/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 4, 2010. | 10-12650 |