Case Information: 55384 | |||
Short Caption: | PIERCE VS. PIERCE (CHILD CUSTODY) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D416418 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/10/2010 / Gaston, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/05/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-03251 | |
02/05/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
02/08/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Carol Menninger - check no. 3576. | ||
02/08/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Family Court Cover Sheet. (CONFIDENTIAL). | 10-03555 | |
02/10/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert E. Gaston | 10-03722 | |
02/18/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 3/10/10 | 10-04437 | |
03/05/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 10-05906 | |
03/16/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference | 10-06929 | |
03/18/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Fn1[we waive the requirement for appellant to file a docketing statement]. NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH | 10-07229 | |
03/18/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |