Case Information: 55366 | |||
Short Caption: | SILL (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C252802 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/03/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-02926 | |
02/03/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/03/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 10-02927 | |
02/03/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/29/10. To Court Reporter: Renee Vincent. | 10-03013 | |
02/08/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Entry of Written Judgment of Order and Suspending Briefing. NRAP 3C deadlines suspended. District court order due: 30 days. | 10-03470 | |
02/08/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 02/03/10. Submitted by counsel for appellant. | 10-03566 | |
02/19/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on February 3, 2010 denying the defendant's motion to reconsider or rectify sentence. | 10-04566 | |
03/11/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. Transcript request due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix: due 50 days. | 10-06520 | |
03/19/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-07298 | |
03/19/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 10-07299 | |
04/07/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-08930 | |
04/07/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 10-08932 | |
06/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-14753 | |
07/06/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-15774 | |
07/06/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/15/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 9, 2010. | 10-15774 |