Case Information: 55400 | |||
Short Caption: | PENNY (WIL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 62318 , 65363 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR090825 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/09/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-03665 | |
02/09/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/09/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 09/23/09, and 01/08/10. Court Reporter: Cecilia Vohl and Julie Federico. Filed in district court on: 02/08/10. | 10-03670 | |
02/17/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Cecilia Vohl stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/23/09. | 10-04309 | |
03/23/2010 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 29, 2010. | 10-07602 | |
03/29/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-08121 | |
03/29/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Joint Appendix | 10-08123 | |
04/19/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-10195 | |
04/19/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 10-10196 | |
07/19/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-18348 | |
08/13/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-19218 | |
08/13/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/02/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 16, 2010. | 10-19218 |