Case Information: 55403 | |||
Short Caption: | POHLABEL (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRFP082220 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 06/07/2011 at 10:00 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 06/07/2011 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/10/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-03694 | |
02/10/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/05/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Manley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/06/09, 10/21/09, and 1/4/10. | 10-05894 | |
03/08/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-05968 | |
03/19/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 30 days. | 10-07331 | |
04/20/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-10254 | |
04/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Joint Appendix. | 10-10255 | |
05/10/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to an Extension of Time within which the Respondent may File It's Fast Track Response. | 10-12103 | |
05/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: June 1, 2010. | 10-12369 | |
05/12/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-12370 | |
09/09/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Full Briefing. This court has concluded that full briefing of this appeal is warranted. Opening Brief due: 30 days. | 10-23035 | |
09/13/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to file the Opening Brief. (30) days. | 10-23549 | |
09/24/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of time to file appellant's opening brief. (30) days. | 10-24571 | |
09/28/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Opening Brief due: November 10, 2010. | 10-24929 | |
11/12/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-29591 | |
12/08/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation For Extension To File Response Brief. (30) days. | 10-31965 | |
12/08/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due date: January 12, 2011. | 10-31971 | |
12/22/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion For Order Requiring District Court Clerk Provide Copy Pre-Sentence Report To Supreme Court. | 10-33393 | |
01/04/2011 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Respondent's Motion to Admit Pre-Sentence Report. | 11-00208 | |
01/07/2011 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Reply To Appellant's Response To Respondent's Motion To Admit Presentence Report. | 11-00752 | |
01/07/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. We deny respondent's motion requesting this court to direct the district court clerk to transmit the presentence investigation report. | 11-00802 | |
01/10/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | 11-00951 | |
02/10/2011 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: February 16, 2011. | 11-04358 | |
02/17/2011 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 11-05090 | |
04/27/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for June 7, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City for 30 minutes before the En Banc Court. | 11-12403 | |
05/11/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order instructing counsel to prepare to address specific issues during oral argument. | 11-13999 | |
05/25/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 11-15470 | |
06/07/2011 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | ||
01/26/2012 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Saitta/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 128 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 1. EN BANC. | 12-02749 | |
02/14/2012 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | 12-04881 | |
02/24/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 55403/55541/53687/53798. | 12-06030 | |
03/20/2012 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | 12-08865 | |
04/16/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-12111 | |
04/16/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
04/20/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 18, 2012. | 12-12111 |