Case Information: 55402 | |||
Short Caption: | CHESSER (AVERY) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR7346 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/09/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/09/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 10-03680 | |
02/09/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. | 10-03681 | |
03/10/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Answer. Due: 20 days. | 10-06312 | |
03/30/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. | 10-08304 | |
03/30/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. State's Appendix. | 10-08305 | |
04/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Emergency Motion for Stay. | 10-10997 | |
04/29/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Emergency Motion for Stay. | 10-11072 | |
05/07/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Petition for Rehearing. (On order denying Emergency Motion for Stay) | 10-11885 | |
05/07/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "We deny the petition." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-11930 | |
05/18/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. Because this court denied petitioner's original writ petition on May 7, 2010, rehearing of this court's order denying the motion for a stay is moot. Accordingly, we deny the petition for rehearing. | 10-12833 | |
06/14/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 10-15296 | |
06/14/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |