Case Information: 55410 | |||
Short Caption: | GARIBAY (ORLANDO) VS. STATE C/W 55375/55411/55412 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 55375 *, 55410, 55411 , 55412 | Related Case(s): | 54311 , 54420 , 54428 , 54463 , 54611 , 54612 , 54633 , 54679 , 54842 , 54966 , 55161 , 55162 , 55163 , 55223 , 55224 , 55375 , 55411 , 55412 , 57207 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 07C234122 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/11/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-03797 | |
02/11/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/11/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP. Nos. 55375/55410/55411/55412. | 10-06381 | |
04/07/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-07086 | |
04/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/15/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 9, 2010. | 10-07086 |