judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VILLA (ADOLFO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 55388
Short Caption:VILLA (ADOLFO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C252762 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/05/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 10-03345
02/05/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/19/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/09/09. 10-04556
03/17/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time Due to Missing Transcript and Other Reasons. (30) days. 10-07155
03/23/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: April 16, 2010. 10-07619
04/01/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Janie Olsen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/04/09, 10/26/09, 10/27/09, 10/28/09, 10/22/09, and 12/29/09. 10-08559
04/19/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 10-10082
04/22/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 17, 2010. 10-10467
05/18/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Four Day Extension. 10-12822
05/24/2010MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Full Briefing or Continuance Until June 11, 2010 10-13361
05/28/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motion for Full Briefing. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 11, 2010. fn1[We deny appellant's motion for an extension of time that was filed on May 18, 2010, as moot.] 10-13957
06/11/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. 10-15218
06/21/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: July 9, 2010. 10-16068
07/09/2010MotionFiled Motion. Appellant Villa's Motion for Leave to File Twenty-Nine (29) Page Fast Track Statement. 10-17764
07/09/2010Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. (FILED PER ORDER 07/14/10). (via E-Flex).
07/09/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 1. 10-17769
07/09/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 2. 10-17771
07/09/2010MotionFiled Motion. Motion Requesting Transmittal of an Exhibit Pursuant to NRAP 30(d). 10-17770
07/14/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement received on E-Flex on July 9, 2010. Fast Track Response due: 20 days. District Court Exhibits (Original State Exhibits 1, 5, 6, 7, 19, 20, 22, 25, 28, 37, 38, 50, 51, and 54 and Defense Exhibits A, B, and C) due: 20 days. 10-18012
07/14/2010Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 10-18013
07/14/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Presentence Investigation Report (PSI).
08/03/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 10-20012
08/10/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Respondent: fast track response due 8/23/10. 10-20609
08/23/2010MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File the Fast Track Response (Second). (20) days. 10-21507
08/24/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: September 13, 2010. 10-21723
09/13/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Third Motion for Extension of Time. (Fast Track Response). 10-23527
09/15/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: 10 days. 10-23741
09/28/2010MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 29 page Fast Track Response. 10-24838
09/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 10-24840
09/29/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track response received via E-Flex on September 28, 2010. 10-25093
09/29/2010Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 10-25094
10/26/2010MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Reply to State's Fast Track Response. 10-28096
11/02/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the reply received via e-flex on October 26, 2010. 10-28605
11/02/2010Other Incoming DocumentFiled Reply to Fast Track Response. 10-28607
01/13/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." 11-01306
01/31/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Appellant. 11-02930
03/17/2011Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). 11-08162
03/23/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration - Appellant. 11-08838
04/19/2011Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." 11-11659
05/16/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned State Exhibits 1, 5, 6, 7, 19, 20, 22, 25, 28, 37, 38, 50, 51 & 54 and Defense Exhibits A, B, and C on this day. 11-14417
05/16/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
06/06/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 20, 2011. 11-14417