Case Information: 55387 | |||
Short Caption: | EPSILANTIS (ANDREW) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C257206 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/14/2011 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/05/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-03321 | |
02/05/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/04/2010 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 8/24/09. Court Reporter: Debra Winn. | 10-05695 | |
03/04/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Debra Winn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/24/09. | 10-05696 | |
03/05/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/21/09, 10/23/09, 10/27/09, 10/28/09, and 12/30/09. | 10-05925 | |
03/17/2010 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 24, 2010. | 10-07158 | |
03/24/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. appellant's Motion for Full Briefing Due to the Complexity of Issues of First Impression and the Inability to Brief Issues within Page Limits Imposed by Rule 3C of the Nevada Rules of Appellant Procedure Alternatively, Motion to Continue for Two Weeks to Complete Research. | 10-07749 | |
03/26/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Full Briefing. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 30 days. | 10-07982 | |
04/15/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol I. | 10-09913 | |
04/15/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-09914 | |
04/15/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol II. | 10-09915 | |
04/15/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol III. | 10-09916 | |
05/17/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. | 10-12697 | |
05/17/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due date: June 16, 2010. | 10-12698 | |
06/16/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-15628 | |
06/17/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: July 16, 2010. | 10-15872 | |
07/19/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-18372 | |
08/26/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to File Reply Brief. (30) days. | 10-21960 | |
09/01/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Stipulation Approved. Reply brief due: September 17, 2010. | 10-22454 | |
09/17/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (7) days. | 10-24016 | |
09/28/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received via E-Flex on September 27, 2010. | 10-24933 | |
09/28/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-24936 | |
01/14/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument. This appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 11-01405 | |
04/28/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." | 11-12531 | |
05/23/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-15031 | |
05/23/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/06/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 31, 2011. | 11-15031 |