Case Information: 55398 | |||
Short Caption: | MILLER (MARK) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 33327 , 34038 , 48890 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C114664 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/03/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/09/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-03656 | |
02/09/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 10-04884 | |
05/03/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-3. | 10-11255 | |
05/03/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-14792 | |
07/07/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-15947 | |
07/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 13. 2010. | 10-15947 |