Case Information: 55397 | |||
Short Caption: | DUFF VS. FOSTER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 33483 , 34312 , 34536 , 34704 , 34717 , 58467 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - D881238 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/09/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
02/09/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 10-03634 | |
02/10/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Tyrone George Duff. Money Order No. 14011911027. | ||
02/18/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-04358 | |
05/24/2010 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Request for Case Status. | 10-13477 | |
06/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." Fn1 [In light of this order, no action is required with respect to appellant's may 24, 2010, request for case status.] NNP10-MC/NS/MG. | 10-15100 | |
06/28/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Appellant. | 10-16762 | |
06/28/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Tyrone Duff - postal money order no. 18314247104. | ||
07/22/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 10-18902 | |
08/02/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | 10-19904 | |
10/13/2010 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. First Request for Case Status. | 10-26793 | |
11/17/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC | 10-30002 | |
11/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Reissue this Court's Order Dening En Banc Reconsideration as an Opinion. | 10-30795 | |
12/13/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-32410 | |
12/13/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 15, 2010. | 10-32410 | |
12/22/2010 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. First Request for Case Status. | 10-33482 | |
01/19/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion for Publication. | 11-01913 | |
01/06/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Returned, unfiled, with letter, Motion for Order of Clarification of This Court's Order Dismissing Appeal, Filed June 10, 2010, that Contradicts the Constitution and Laws of the State of Nevada. | 14-00303 |