judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARGARET M. ERNST,ETAL V. D.C.DEPT. CONSUMER & REG. AFFAIRS

Case Information: 10-CV-1179
Short Caption:MARGARET M. ERNST,ETAL V. D.C.DEPT. CONSUMER & REG. AFFAIRSClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5006-10Filed Date:09/16/2010

Opening Event Date:09/16/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/09/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMargaret M. Ernst N
Cornish F. HitchcockNY
AppellantE. E. Jenney N
Cornish F. HitchcockNY
AppelleeD.C. Department of Consumer and Regulatory AffairsN
Todd S. KimNY
AppelleeZp 29th Place, LLCN
John T. EptingNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/16/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/08/2010CIVIL APPEALS SCREENING STATEMENT aplt
10/08/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
10/18/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 16, 2010, and the statement regarding transcript and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, if the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
10/21/2010RECORD INDEX
10/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/26/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/22/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (no oppo).
11/24/2010 On consideration of appellants' consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellants' brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before January 5, 2011. (JAC) elp
01/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until Janaury 26, 2011 (no oppo)
01/05/2011 On consideration of appellants' consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellants' brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before January 26, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
01/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL no oppo
01/18/2011 On consideration of appellants' consent motion to dismiss this appeal, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and this appeal is hereby dismissed and each party to bear its own costs. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b). (ETW) elp
01/18/2011DISMISSED
02/09/2011MANDATE ISSUED