Case Information: 36311 | |||
Short Caption: | LUTHER (SID) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 40696 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C149922 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/07/2000 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/20/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/20/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-10513 | |
08/04/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Records due: 120 days. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36150, 36151, 36155, 36159, 36278, 36287, 36311. Document No. 00-13553. | ||
12/07/2000 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on: 12/05/00. | 00-21435 | |
12/07/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/17/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 01-21134 | |
01/14/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-00516 | |
01/14/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/01/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2002. | 02-00516 |